OK SB756 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB756
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
State Capitol; management and control of space. Effective date.
Title
State Capitol; management and control of space. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | Senate | HAs read |
2017-04-27 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-26 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-26 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 2 |
2017-04-26 | House | General Order |
2017-04-11 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2017-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Rules Committee |
2017-03-28 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2017-03-23 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McBride (principal House author) |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Marlatt |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB756 (Carry Over) 2017-04-27 - HAs read
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
73 | 15 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 15 | 2 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 15 | 3 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 15 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 62 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 83 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 4105 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 4107 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |