OK SB751 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Mental health; relating to transportation of persons for mental health services; providing certain construction. Effective date.
Title
Mental health; relating to transportation of persons for mental health services; providing certain construction. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim David [R] | Rep. Charles McCall [R] | Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] | Rep. Josh Cockroft [R] |
Sen. Ron Sharp [R] | Rep. Justin Wood [R] | Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-05 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - House: Public Safety Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - House: Public Safety Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/12/2015 |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-05-06 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2015-05-05 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2015-04-21 | Senate | HAs read |
2015-04-21 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-20 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-04-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 1 |
2015-04-20 | House | Amended |
2015-04-20 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Sharp |
2015-04-20 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cockroft, Wood, Sherrer |
2015-04-20 | House | General Order |
2015-04-09 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee |
2015-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2015-03-11 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2015-02-26 | Senate | coauthored by McCall (principal House author) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | coauthored by Pittman |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator David |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |