OK SB747 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB747
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Second Reading referred to Insurance
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Second Reading referred to Insurance
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Health insurance; prohibiting insurer from discriminating against insured based on vaccination status. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Health insurance; prohibiting insurer from discriminating against insured based on vaccination status. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - House - House: Insurance Committee: E DO PASS (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 33 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Retirement And Insurance: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 33 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Retirement And Insurance: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2021-03-11 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 10 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Davis (principal House author) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Jett |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Standridge |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB747 (Carry Over) 2021-03-22 - Second Reading referred to Insurance