OK SB701 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB701
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Workers' compensation; modifying provisions of the Administrative Workers' Compensation Act. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Workers' compensation; modifying provisions of the Administrative Workers' Compensation Act. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE AND ENACTING (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE AND ENACTING (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | Senate | Died in conference |
2019-05-15 | Senate | SCs named Daniels, Jech, Paxton, Leewright, Brooks, Floyd |
2019-05-13 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Rules |
2019-05-08 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2019-04-29 | Senate | HAs read |
2019-04-29 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-25 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-25 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-25 | House | General Order |
2019-04-15 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Withdrawn from Calendar; referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2019-03-27 | House | Title stricken |
2019-03-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Judiciary Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 9 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Kannady (principal House author) |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Daniels |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB701 (Carry Over) 2019-05-23 - Died in conference