OK SB691 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-03 - Coauthored by Senator(s) Shortey
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-03 - Coauthored by Senator(s) Shortey
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Motor vehicle insurance; Compulsory Insurance Law; prohibiting recovery for damages or claims against insurer for motor vehicle accidents. Effective date.
Title
Motor vehicle insurance; Compulsory Insurance Law; prohibiting recovery for damages or claims against insurer for motor vehicle accidents. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE TITLE AND ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Shortey |
2013-04-03 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Christian |
2013-04-03 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2013-04-03 | House | Title stricken |
2013-04-03 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Judiciary Committee |
2013-03-18 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2013-03-07 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 9 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-02-21 | Senate | coauthored by Nelson (principal House author) |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance committee; CR filed |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Insurance |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules committee |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Aldridge |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |