OK SB675 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB675
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-03 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-03 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
State parks; transferring the Hugo Lake Park to the Oklahoma Tourism and Recreation Department. Effective date.
Title
State parks; transferring the Hugo Lake Park to the Oklahoma Tourism and Recreation Department. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-03 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Tourism & Wildlife: DO PASS AMENDED CS (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Tourism & Wildlife: DO PASS AMENDED CS (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-03 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2023-03-29 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2023-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2023-03-23 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Humphrey (principal House author) |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Title stricken |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Rogers |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Emergency removed |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bullard |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Burns |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB675 (Carry Over) 2023-04-03 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources Subcommittee