OK SB675 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future SB675

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-03 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

State parks; transferring the Hugo Lake Park to the Oklahoma Tourism and Recreation Department. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State parks; transferring the Hugo Lake Park to the Oklahoma Tourism and Recreation Department. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-03 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations Senate Bill: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Tourism & Wildlife Senate Bill: DO PASS AMENDED CS (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Tourism & Wildlife: DO PASS AMENDED CS (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Tourism & Wildlife: DO PASS AMENDED CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-03HouseRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources Subcommittee
2023-03-29HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources Subcommittee
2023-03-29HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2023-03-23HouseFirst Reading
2023-03-23SenateEngrossed to House
2023-03-22SenateReferred for engrossment
2023-03-22SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
2023-03-22SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2023-02-15SenateCoauthored by Representative Humphrey (principal House author)
2023-02-15SenateTitle stricken
2023-02-15SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
2023-02-14SenateCoauthored by Senator Rogers
2023-02-08SenateReferred to Appropriations
2023-02-08SenateEmergency removed
2023-02-08SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed
2023-02-07SenateCoauthored by Senator Bullard
2023-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2023-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Burns
2023-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB675 (Carry Over) 2023-04-03 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources Subcommittee

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb675&Session=2300
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20INT/SB/SB675%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB675%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/SFLR/SB675%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENGR/SB/SB675%20ENGR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/SB675%20PCS.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB675%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB675%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/impact%20statements/fiscal/Senate/SB675%20INT%20FI.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB675%20ENGR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB675_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB675_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback