OK SB670 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
County purchasing; modifying procedures for processing county purchase orders. Emergency.
Title
County purchasing; modifying procedures for processing county purchase orders. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-23 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/23/2013 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-17 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2013-04-16 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-04-16 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2013-04-16 | House | General Order |
2013-04-01 | House | CR; Do Pass General Government Committee |
2013-03-14 | House | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2013-03-06 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government committee; CR filed |
2013-02-05 | Senate | coauthored by Murphey (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Griffin |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |