OK SB638 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-09 - CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-09 - CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Education; allowing students who demonstrate mastery on certain tests to be promoted or graduate. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Education; allowing students who demonstrate mastery on certain tests to be promoted or graduate. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Clark Jolley [R] | Rep. Elise Hall [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-08 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-09 | House | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee |
2013-03-14 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2013-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2013-02-07 | Senate | coauthored by Hall (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Jolley |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |