OK SB620 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB620
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-05 - CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-05 - CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Professional Entity Act; modifying requirements for persons holding interest in domestic professional entity; prohibiting certain persons from holding shares in certain professional corporations. Effective date.
Title
Professional Entity Act; modifying requirements for persons holding interest in domestic professional entity; prohibiting certain persons from holding shares in certain professional corporations. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate: from holding shares in certain professional (Y: 40 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary Senate Bill: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate: from holding shares in certain professional (Y: 40 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary Senate Bill: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-05 | House | CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2023-03-22 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 3 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Title restored |
2023-03-21 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Title stricken |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author) |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Montgomery |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB620 (Carry Over) 2023-04-05 - CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee