OK SB603 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB603
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Dentistry; broadening permitted examinations for licensure; temporary licenses; permits; continuing education requirements.
Title
Dentistry; broadening permitted examinations for licensure; temporary licenses; permits; continuing education requirements.
Sponsors
Sen. John Montgomery [R] | Rep. Josh West [R] | Rep. Dustin Roberts [R] | Sen. Frank Simpson [R] |
Sen. Paul Rosino [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/15/2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-05-09 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2019-04-29 | Senate | HAs read |
2019-04-29 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-25 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-25 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-25 | House | Amended |
2019-04-25 | House | General Order |
2019-04-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Dustin) |
2019-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2019-02-28 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative West (Josh) (principal House author) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Simpson |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Rosino |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Montgomery |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB603 (Carry Over) 2019-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2019