OK SB602 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB602
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Documentary stamp tax; authorizing direct apportionment to specified funds; changing type of fund; providing for transfer. Effective date.
Title
Documentary stamp tax; authorizing direct apportionment to specified funds; changing type of fund; providing for transfer. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2021-03-09 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Pfeiffer (principal House author) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-Education sub-committee |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-Education |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Rader |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB602 (Carry Over) 2021-03-23 - Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee