OK SB532 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/23/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Foreclosure of medical marijuana businesses; establishing procedures for continuation of operations of certain foreclosed businesses; medical marijuana business licenses. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Foreclosure of medical marijuana businesses; establishing procedures for continuation of operations of certain foreclosed businesses; medical marijuana business licenses. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-20 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 85 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23SenateApproved by Governor 05/23/2019
2019-05-20SenateSent to Governor
2019-05-20HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-05-20SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-05-20SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-05-20HouseTo Senate
2019-05-20HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 1
2019-05-20HouseCCR adopted
2019-05-17HouseCCR submitted
2019-05-17SenateMeasure passed, to House: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0
2019-05-17SenateCCR adopted
2019-05-16SenateCCR read
2019-05-07SenateSCs named Brooks, Daniels, Paxton, Leewright, Boren, Floyd
2019-05-06HouseConference granted, naming Conference Committee on Rules
2019-05-02SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2019-04-22SenateHAs read
2019-04-22HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-04-18HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-04-18HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 2
2019-04-18HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-09HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2019-03-06HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-06SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-05SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-05SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 5
2019-03-05SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-02-26SenateReported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
2019-02-19SenateCoauthored by Senator McCortney
2019-02-19SenateCoauthored by Representative Fetgatter (principal House author)
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Brooks
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb532&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/SB/SB532%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/SB532%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/SB/SB532%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB532%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/SB532%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB532%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/SB/SB532%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB532_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB532_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback