OK SB51 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB51
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Second Reading referred to Common Education
Pending: House Common Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Second Reading referred to Common Education
Pending: House Common Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Teacher certification; removing requirement for general education portion of examination. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Teacher certification; removing requirement for general education portion of examination. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 33 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2021-03-02 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 12 |
2021-03-01 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Sterling (principal House author) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Hicks |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB51 (Carry Over) 2021-03-22 - Second Reading referred to Common Education