OK SB475 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB475
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Approved by Governor 06/09/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Approved by Governor 06/09/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Uniform Controlled Dangerous Substances Act; defining certain term; modifying certain registration suspension and revocation guidelines; modifying certain registration guidelines; modifying certain requirement. Emergency.
Title
Uniform Controlled Dangerous Substances Act; defining certain term; modifying certain registration suspension and revocation guidelines; modifying certain registration guidelines; modifying certain requirement. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-19 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS AMENDED CS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS AMENDED CS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 06/09/2023 |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2023-05-22 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 3 |
2023-05-19 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2023-04-25 | Senate | HAs read |
2023-04-25 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-04-24 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-04-24 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0 |
2023-04-24 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Lepak |
2023-04-24 | House | General Order |
2023-04-05 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle |
2023-04-05 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2023-03-22 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author) |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Paxton |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB475 (Carry Over) 2023-06-09 - Approved by Governor 06/09/2023