OK SB465 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB465
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-09 - Coauthored by Senator Jett
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-09 - Coauthored by Senator Jett
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public employees' retirement; authorizing certain members to purchase years of military service credit.
Title
Public employees' retirement; authorizing certain members to purchase years of military service credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Retirement And Insurance: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Jett |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Legislative Actuary under 62 O.S., Section 3108 |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Simpson |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB465 (Carry Over) 2021-02-09 - Coauthored by Senator Jett