OK SB441 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-06 - Coauthored by Senator(s) Bergstrom, Rogers
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicles; prohibiting contracting for use of photo monitoring devices. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles; prohibiting contracting for use of photo monitoring devices. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-06 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-06HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Bergstrom, Rogers
2021-04-06HouseCR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
2021-03-22HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2021-03-04HouseFirst Reading
2021-03-04SenateEngrossed to House
2021-03-03SenateReferred for engrossment
2021-03-03SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 6
2021-03-03SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2021-02-18SenateCoauthored by Representative Steagall (principal House author)
2021-02-03SenateReported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
2021-02-02SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2021-02-01SenateAuthored by Senator Dahm
2021-02-01SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb441&Session=2100
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/SB/SB441%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/SFLR/SB441%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/SB/SB441%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/HFLR/SB441%20HFLR.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB441%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB441%20ENGR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB441_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB441_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments 750

feedback