OK SB410 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Veto message read
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Juvenile offenses; making persons charged with certain crime eligible for youthful offender status; modifying inclusions to youthful offender guidelines. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juvenile offenses; making persons charged with certain crime eligible for youthful offender status; modifying inclusions to youthful offender guidelines. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-19 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-05SenateVeto message read
2015-06-05SenateVetoed 06/05/2015
2015-05-20SenateSent to Governor
2015-05-20HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2015-05-20SenateEnrolled, to House
2015-05-20SenateReferred for enrollment
2015-05-20HouseTo Senate
2015-05-20HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0
2015-05-20HouseCCR adopted
2015-05-19HouseCCR submitted
2015-05-19SenateMeasure passed, to House: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
2015-05-19SenateCCR adopted
2015-05-15SenateCCR read
2015-05-11HouseConference granted, naming Conference Committee on Criminal Justice and Corrections
2015-04-28SenateSCs named Brooks, Sykes, David, Crain, Treat, Floyd, Sparks
2015-04-08SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2015-04-06SenateHAs read
2015-04-02HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2015-04-01HouseReferred for engrossment
2015-04-01HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 13
2015-04-01HouseGeneral Order
2015-03-25HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee
2015-03-17HouseSecond Reading referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections
2015-03-10HouseFirst Reading
2015-03-10SenateEngrossed to House
2015-03-10SenateReferred for engrossment
2015-03-10SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
2015-03-10SenateTitle restored
2015-03-10SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2015-02-24SenateTitle stricken
2015-02-24SenateReported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
2015-02-18Senatecoauthored by Johnson (principal House author)
2015-02-03SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2015-02-02SenateAuthored by Senator Brooks
2015-02-02SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10A25New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb410&Session=1500
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20INT/SB/SB410%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/SFLR/SB410%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENGR/SB/SB410%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/HFLR/SB410%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB410%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB410%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCCS/SB410%20CCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENR/SB/SB410%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/SB410_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/SB410_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback