OK SB394 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-03 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-03 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Firearms; adding district attorneys who may carry a firearm. Effective date.
Title
Firearms; adding district attorneys who may carry a firearm. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee |
2013-03-18 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2013-03-07 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 1 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2013-02-05 | Senate | coauthored by Hulbert (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator David |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |