OK SB380 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-23 - Referred to Appropriations and Budget Committee
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-23 - Referred to Appropriations and Budget Committee
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public finance; authorizing issuance of obligations for dam and stream projects in Tulsa County. Emergency.
Title
Public finance; authorizing issuance of obligations for dam and stream projects in Tulsa County. Emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-23 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2009-03-23 | Withdrawn from General Government Committee | |
2009-03-18 | Second Reading referred to General Government | |
2009-03-12 | First Reading | |
2009-03-12 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-03-11 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-11 | Emergency passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 7 | |
2009-03-11 | Measure passed: Ayes: 29 Nays: 10 | |
2009-03-11 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-02-17 | coauthored by Lamons (principal House author) | |
2009-02-17 | Title stricken | |
2009-02-17 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-17 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Lamons | |
2009-02-12 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Laster | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
73 | 334 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
73 | 336 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |