OK SB332 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-14 - Approved by Governor 05/14/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-14 - Approved by Governor 05/14/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Gross production tax; eliminating certain reporting requirements and procedures relating to release of information. Effective date.
Title
Gross production tax; eliminating certain reporting requirements and procedures relating to release of information. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 49 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - House - House: Revenue and Tax Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 49 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - House - House: Revenue and Tax Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-14 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/14/2013 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-08 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2013-04-23 | Senate | HAs read |
2013-04-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-04-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 19 |
2013-04-22 | House | General Order |
2013-04-08 | House | Title restored |
2013-04-08 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2013-03-18 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2013-02-21 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2013-02-20 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-02-05 | Senate | coauthored by Sears (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Mazzei |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |