OK SB31 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB31
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Medical marijuana; clarifying language relating to grams for accreditation of OSBI labs. Effective date.
Title
Medical marijuana; clarifying language relating to grams for accreditation of OSBI labs. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Wayne Shaw [R] | Rep. Ben Loring [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/25/2019 |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-22 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-17 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-17 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-17 | House | General Order |
2019-04-09 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-03-05 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-03-04 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Loring (principal House author) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Shaw |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB31 (Carry Over) 2019-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2019