OK SB273 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB273
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Liens on personal property; requiring registration for persons preparing certain notices. Effective date.
Title
Liens on personal property; requiring registration for persons preparing certain notices. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 40 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 72 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 72 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/12/2021 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-05-06 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 4 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2021-04-15 | Senate | HAs read |
2021-04-15 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-04-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-04-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 19 |
2021-04-14 | House | General Order |
2021-04-07 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil |
2021-03-11 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Title restored |
2021-03-10 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Title stricken |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Miller (principal House author) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Quinn |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB273 (Carry Over) 2021-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2021