OK SB242 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Pain-management clinics; providing for registration and regulation of pain-management clinics. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pain-management clinics; providing for registration and regulation of pain-management clinics. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2019-03-14HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-14SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-13SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-13SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
2019-03-13SenateTitle restored
2019-03-13SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2019-02-20SenateTitle stricken
2019-02-20SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2019-02-11SenateReferred to Appropriations
2019-02-11SenateTitle stricken
2019-02-11SenateReported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2019-02-06SenateCoauthored by Representative Caldwell (Chad) (principal House author)
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Standridge
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback