OK SB236 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB236
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-07 - Coauthored by Representative Osborn (Leslie) (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-07 - Coauthored by Representative Osborn (Leslie) (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Public finance; authorizing issuance of obligations for new public health lab for Department of Health. Effective Date.
Title
Public finance; authorizing issuance of obligations for new public health lab for Department of Health. Effective Date.
Sponsors
Rep. Leslie Osborn [R] | Sen. Kim David [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Osborn (Leslie) (principal House author) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator David |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB236 (Carry Over) 2017-03-07 - Coauthored by Representative Osborn (Leslie) (principal House author)