OK SB232 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB232
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Approved by Governor 04/18/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Approved by Governor 04/18/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Definitions and general provisions; designating Oklahoma as a Purple Heart State. Effective date.
Title
Definitions and general provisions; designating Oklahoma as a Purple Heart State. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Simpson [R] | Rep. Tommy Hardin [R] | Rep. Kevin McDugle [R] | Rep. Josh West [R] |
Sen. Tom Dugger [R] | Sen. Paul Rosino [R] | Sen. Brenda Stanley [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House: Veterans and Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House: Veterans and Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/18/2019 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-16 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-15 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 100 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-15 | House | General Order |
2019-03-25 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Josh) |
2019-03-25 | House | CR; Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs |
2019-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 48 Nays: 0 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Dugger |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McDugle |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Stanley |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Rosino |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hardin (Tommy) (principal House author) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Simpson |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB232 (Carry Over) 2019-04-16 - Approved by Governor 04/18/2019