OK SB220 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB220
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-12 - CR; Do Pass County and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-12 - CR; Do Pass County and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Public employees; recognition programs. Effective date.
Title
Public employees; recognition programs. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-12 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-12 | House | CR; Do Pass County and Municipal Government Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government |
2017-02-21 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 4 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Cockroft (principal House author) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Standridge |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB220 (Carry Over) 2017-04-12 - CR; Do Pass County and Municipal Government Committee