OK SB217 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/13/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Teacher certification; directing the State Department of Education to implement certification pilot program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teacher certification; directing the State Department of Education to implement certification pilot program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by Governor 05/13/2019
2019-05-07SenateSent to Governor
2019-05-07HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-05-07SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-05-06SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-05-06SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1
2019-05-06SenateHAs adopted
2019-04-25SenateHAs read
2019-04-25HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-04-24HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-04-24HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 9
2019-04-24HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-04HouseTitle restored
2019-04-04HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Bergstrom
2019-04-04HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
2019-03-27HouseRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
2019-03-20HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2019-03-14HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-14SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-13SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-13SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
2019-03-13SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-03-11SenateCoauthored by Representative Nollan (principal House author)
2019-02-27SenateTitle stricken
2019-02-27SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
2019-02-19SenateReferred to Appropriations
2019-02-19SenateEmergency clause stricken
2019-02-19SenateTitle stricken
2019-02-19SenateReported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Thompson
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb217&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/SB/SB217%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB217%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/SB217%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/SB/SB217%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB217%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/SB217%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB217%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/SB/SB217%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB217_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB217_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback