OK SB2045 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Insurance; relating to the Small Employer Health Insurance Reform Act; requiring the development of a questionnaire by the Insurance Commissioner; requiring same coverage for all minors. Effective date.
Title
Insurance; relating to the Small Employer Health Insurance Reform Act; requiring the development of a questionnaire by the Insurance Commissioner; requiring same coverage for all minors. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Lisa Billy [R] | Sen. Cliff Branan [R] | Sen. Bill Brown [R] | Rep. George Faught [R] |
Rep. Mark McCullough [R] | Rep. Randy McDaniel [R] | Rep. Lewis Moore [R] | Rep. Daniel Sullivan [R] |
Rep. Sue Tibbs [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-19 - House - House: R THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-03-31 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-31 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-26 | Approved by Governor 04/22/2010 | |
2010-04-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-20 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-04-20 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-04-19 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-04-19 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-04-19 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-19 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Tibbs, McDaniel (Randy), Billy, Faught, McCullough, Moore | |
2010-04-19 | General Order | |
2010-03-31 | CR; Do Pass Economic Development and Financial Services Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services | |
2010-03-02 | First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-01 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-01 | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-01 | coauthored by Branan | |
2010-03-01 | General Order, Amended | |
2010-02-16 | coauthored by Sullivan (principal House author) | |
2010-02-16 | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-15 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Sullivan | |
2010-02-11 | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Brown | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 6060 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 6519 | New Code | See Bill Text |