OK SB195 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Constitutional amendment; clarifying no provision of the Constitution secures or protects a right to perform or receive an abortion. Ballot title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Constitutional amendment; clarifying no provision of the Constitution secures or protects a right to perform or receive an abortion. Ballot title.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2019-03-18HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-18SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-14SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-14SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 8
2019-03-14SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2019-03-14SenateRemove as coauthor Senator Bullard
2019-03-13SenateCoauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author)
2019-03-13SenateCoauthored by Senator Smalley
2019-03-11SenateCoauthored by Senator Pederson
2019-02-25SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2019-02-25SenateCoauthored by Senator Scott
2019-02-25SenateCoauthored by Senator Thompson
2019-02-21SenateCoauthored by Senator David
2019-02-21SenateRemove as author Senator Rader; authored by Senator Treat
2019-02-12SenateCoauthored by Senator Bullard
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Rader
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback