MI HB4063 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-30 - Referred To Committee On Housing And Human Services
Pending: Senate Housing And Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-30 - Referred To Committee On Housing And Human Services
Pending: Senate Housing And Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Civil rights: housing discrimination; housing discrimination based on source of income; prohibit. Amends title & sec. 502 of 1976 PA 453 (MCL 37.2502). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0206'23, SB 0207'23
Title
Civil rights: housing discrimination; housing discrimination based on source of income; prohibit. Amends title & sec. 502 of 1976 PA 453 (MCL 37.2502). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0206'23, SB 0207'23
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 272 (Y: 56 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 262 (Y: 57 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 262 (Y: 57 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Housing And Human Services |
2024-06-27 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 272 Yeas 56 Nays 54 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2024-06-27 | House | Vote On Passage Reconsidered |
2024-06-27 | House | Transmitted |
2024-06-27 | House | Title Amended |
2024-06-27 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 262 Yeas 57 Nays 53 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2024-06-27 | House | Read A Third Time |
2024-06-26 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2024-06-26 | House | Substitute (h-3) Adopted |
2024-06-26 | House | Read A Second Time |
2024-05-15 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2024-05-15 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-3) |
2023-02-02 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/01/2023 |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2023-02-01 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-02-01 | House | Introduced By Representative Jason Morgan |