MI SB0207 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 11 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-27 - Returned To Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Civil rights: housing discrimination; housing discrimination based on source of income; prohibit. Amends title & sec. 502 of 1976 PA 453 (MCL 37.2502). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4063'23

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil rights: housing discrimination; housing discrimination based on source of income; prohibit. Amends title & sec. 502 of 1976 PA 453 (MCL 37.2502). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4063'23

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 515 (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-27HouseReturned To Senate
2024-06-27HouseTitle Amended
2024-06-27HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 265 Yeas 56 Nays 54 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2024-06-27HouseRead A Third Time
2024-06-26HousePlaced On Third Reading
2024-06-26HouseSubstitute (h-1) Adopted
2024-06-26HouseRead A Second Time
2024-05-15HouseReferred To Second Reading
2024-05-15HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
2023-10-11HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2023-10-11HouseRead A First Time
2023-10-11HouseReceived On 10/11/2023
2023-10-11SenatePassed Roll Call # 515 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2023-10-11SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2023-10-11SenateRules Suspended
2023-10-11SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-3)
2023-10-11SenateSubstitute (s-3) Concurred In
2023-10-11SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-3)
2023-06-14SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2023-06-14SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2023-03-16SenateReferred To Committee On Housing And Human Services
2023-03-16SenateIntroduced By Senator Jeff Irwin

Same As/Similar To

HB4063 (Same As) 2024-06-27 - Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 272 Yeas 56 Nays 54 Excused 0 Not Voting 0

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://legislature.mi.gov/Bills/Bill?ObjectName=2023-SB-0207
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2023-SIB-0207.htm
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2023-SEBS-0207.htm
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2023-SEBH-0207.htm
Amendmenthttps://legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2023-SCVBS-0207-00C76.pdf
Amendmenthttps://legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2023-SCVBS-0207-00D47.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2023-SFA-0205-G.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2023-SFA-0205-F.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2023-SFA-0205-C.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/House/pdf/2023-HLA-0205-5A9B07DF.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/House/pdf/2023-HLA-0205-193894CC.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/House/pdf/2023-HLA-0205-B433419C.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/House/pdf/2023-HLA-0205-E4300C9F.pdf
Roll Callhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/Senate/htm/2023-SJ-06-14-057.htm
Roll Callhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/Senate/htm/2023-SJ-10-11-087.htm
Roll Callhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/House/htm/2024-HJ-05-15-043.htm

Bill Comments

feedback