OK SB1862 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-06 - Second Reading, direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-06 - Second Reading, direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Dentistry; modifying requirements; providing exclusions; modifying time elements. Effective date.
Title
Dentistry; modifying requirements; providing exclusions; modifying time elements. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-06 | House | Second Reading, direct to Calendar |
2020-03-16 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Kirt |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |