OK SB1772 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - Coauthored by Senator Pederson
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - Coauthored by Senator Pederson
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public health; establishing the Oklahoma Rare Disease Advisory Council. Effective date.
Title
Public health; establishing the Oklahoma Rare Disease Advisory Council. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-26 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pederson |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Boatman (principal House author) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Hicks |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |