OK SB1760 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 28-3)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Oklahoma Riot Control and Prevention Act; providing that certain provisions shall not be construed to allow certain actions by certain officials. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oklahoma Riot Control and Prevention Act; providing that certain provisions shall not be construed to allow certain actions by certain officials. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-16 Approved by Governor 05/16/2012
2012-05-10 Sent to Governor
2012-05-10 Signed, returned to Senate
2012-05-10 Enrolled, to House
2012-05-09 Referred for enrollment
2012-05-09 Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1
2012-05-09 coauthored by Brecheen, Marlatt, Stanislawski, Newberry, Brinkley, Branan, Holt, Brown, Barrington, Halligan, Griffin, Johnson (Rob), Treat, Sparks, Crain
2012-05-09 HAs adopted
2012-04-30 HAs read
2012-04-30 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2012-04-26 Referred for engrossment
2012-04-26 Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 0
2012-04-26 Amended
2012-04-26 Coauthored by Representative(s) Bennett, Derby, Vaughan, Christian, Lockhart, Moore, Kern
2012-04-26 General Order
2012-04-04 Coauthored by Representative(s) Johnson
2012-04-04 CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
2012-03-19 Second Reading referred to Public Safety
2012-03-14 First Reading
2012-03-14 Engrossed to House
2012-03-13 Referred for engrossment
2012-03-13 Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
2012-03-13 coauthored by Simpson, Jolley
2012-03-13 General Order, Considered
2012-02-27 coauthored by Allen, Garrison, Russell, Shortey
2012-02-27 coauthored by Shannon (principal House author)
2012-02-27 Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
2012-02-07 Second Reading referred to Public Safety
2012-02-06 Authored by Senator Sykes
2012-02-06 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2113214New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback