OK SB1754 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/20/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/20/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public health and safety; modifying definitions related to pharmaceuticals. Effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; modifying definitions related to pharmaceuticals. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-06 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Approved by Governor 04/20/2010 | |
2010-04-15 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-15 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-04-15 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-04-14 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-04-14 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-04-14 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 1 | |
2010-04-14 | General Order | |
2010-04-06 | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | |
2010-02-23 | First Reading | |
2010-02-23 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-02-22 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-02-22 | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2010-02-22 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-02-15 | coauthored by Denney (principal House author) | |
2010-02-15 | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-11 | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-02 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Denney | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Leftwich | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |