OK SB1739 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-02 - Title restored
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-02 - Title restored
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Inmate medical care; assigning responsibility of medical care costs to persons in custody for preexisting conditions or self-inflicted injuries. Effective date.
Title
Inmate medical care; assigning responsibility of medical care costs to persons in custody for preexisting conditions or self-inflicted injuries. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Crain [R] | Rep. Scott Biggs [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-02 - House - House: Public Safety Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | House | Title restored |
2014-04-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee |
2014-03-13 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2014-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2014-02-18 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2014-02-05 | Senate | coauthored by Biggs (principal House author) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Crain |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |