OK SB1714 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Homemade food products; renaming the Home Bakery Act of 2013; modifying definitions of act; authorizing production and sale of certain foods. Effective date.
Title
Homemade food products; renaming the Home Bakery Act of 2013; modifying definitions of act; authorizing production and sale of certain foods. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Pugh [R] | Rep. Garry Mize [R] | Rep. Lewis Moore [R] | Rep. Todd Russ [R] |
Rep. Mark Lepak [R] | Rep. Cyndi Munson [D] | Rep. Justin Humphrey [R] | Rep. Ryan Martinez [R] |
Rep. Kevin McDugle [R] | Rep. Mike Osburn [R] | Rep. Denise Hader [R] | Rep. Jay Steagall [R] |
Rep. Cynthia Roe [R] | Rep. Randy Randleman [R] | Rep. Ajay Pittman [D] | Rep. Kenton Patzkowsky [R] |
Rep. Jim Olsen [R] | Rep. Nicole Miller [R] | Rep. Brian Hill [R] | Rep. Derrel Fincher [R] |
Rep. Tammy Townley [R] | Rep. Judd Strom [R] | Rep. Sherrie Conley [R] | Rep. Kevin West [R] |
Sen. Joseph Silk [R] | Sen. Micheal Bergstrom [R] | Sen. Casey Murdock [R] | Sen. Mary Boren [D] |
Sen. Chuck Hall [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 69 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Agriculture And Wildlife: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Agriculture And Wildlife: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | Senate | HAs read |
2020-05-15 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-05-15 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-05-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 13 |
2020-05-15 | House | Amended |
2020-05-15 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Hall |
2020-05-15 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Lepak, Fincher, Patzkowsky, Humphrey, Pittman, Osburn, CrosswhiteHader, West (Kevin), Strom, Townley, Miller, Randleman, Russ, Hill, Steagall, Conley, McDugle, Martinez, Olsen, Moore, Munson, Roe |
2020-05-15 | House | General Order |
2020-04-06 | House | Withdrawn from Business and Commerce, Direct to Calendar |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2020-03-04 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 5 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Boren |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Mize (principal House author) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Silk |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Murdock |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Pugh |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |