OK SB1707 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Coauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Coauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
21st Century Quality Jobs; providing for transfer to other incentive payments upon failure to meet requirements. Effective date.
Title
21st Century Quality Jobs; providing for transfer to other incentive payments upon failure to meet requirements. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Title stricken |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Leewright |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |