OK SB1677 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-20 - Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-20 - Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Bail bondsman; suspension of license; modifying references. Effective date.
Title
Bail bondsman; suspension of license; modifying references. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. John Sparks [D] | Rep. Dan Kirby [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance committee; CR filed |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Insurance |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules committee |
2014-02-12 | Senate | coauthored by Kirby (principal House author) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sparks |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Oklahoma State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb1677&Session=1400 |
Text | http://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/2013-14bills/SB/sb1677_int.rtf |