OK SB1671 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-22 - coauthored by Dank (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-22 - coauthored by Dank (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; providing penalties for members of Legislature who fail to disclose conflict of interest.
Title
Crimes and punishments; providing penalties for members of Legislature who fail to disclose conflict of interest.
Sponsors
Rep. David Dank [R] | Sen. Andrew Rice [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-22 | coauthored by Dank (principal House author) | |
2010-02-22 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-22 | Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-18 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Dank | |
2010-02-17 | Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Rice | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Oklahoma State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb1671&Session=1000 |
Text | http://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/2009-10bills/SB/sb1671_int.rtf |