OK SB1658 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/23/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/23/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal procedure; imposing statute of limitations on certain offense; modifying grounds for which certain prosecutions may be commenced; providing for retroactive applicability. Effective date.
Title
Criminal procedure; imposing statute of limitations on certain offense; modifying grounds for which certain prosecutions may be commenced; providing for retroactive applicability. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Jessica Garvin [R] | Rep. Jon Echols [R] | Rep. Monroe Nichols [D] | Rep. Dean Davis [R] |
Rep. Jared Deck [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-23 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/23/2024 |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2024-05-21 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2024-05-20 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Nichols |
2024-04-16 | Senate | HAs read |
2024-04-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-04-15 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-04-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2024-04-15 | House | Amended |
2024-04-15 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis, Deck |
2024-04-15 | House | General Order |
2024-03-28 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2024-03-25 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil |
2024-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 48 Nays: 0 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author) |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Garvin |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |