OK SB1650 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Business and Commerce, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Business and Commerce, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; creating Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing Program Act; defining terms; requiring insurance. Effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; creating Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing Program Act; defining terms; requiring insurance. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Rosino [R] | Rep. Lonnie Sims [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | House | Withdrawn from Business and Commerce, Direct to Calendar |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2020-03-04 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 3 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Title restored |
2020-03-03 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Sims (principal House author) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Title stricken |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Rosino |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |