OK SB1601 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Approved by Governor 04/20/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Approved by Governor 04/20/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
County pensions; authorizing one-time lump sum contribution; modifying contribution amounts for certain employees. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
County pensions; authorizing one-time lump sum contribution; modifying contribution amounts for certain employees. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Rader [R] | Rep. Carol Bush [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House: Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Retirement And Insurance: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House: Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Retirement And Insurance: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/20/2022 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2022-04-19 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2022-04-18 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2022-04-18 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 1 |
2022-04-18 | House | General Order |
2022-04-04 | House | CR; Do Pass Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee |
2022-03-30 | House | Second Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions |
2022-03-23 | House | First Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Title restored |
2022-03-22 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Title stricken |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Withdrawn from General Government committee |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Bush (principal House author) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Rader |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |