OK SB158 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-08 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-08 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Initiative and referendum; modifying procedures for circulation of petitions; requiring notifications. Effective date.
Title
Initiative and referendum; modifying procedures for circulation of petitions; requiring notifications. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Randon Grau [R] | Sen. Ann Griffin [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-08 - House - House: Elections and Ethics Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-08 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2015-04-08 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Elections and Ethics Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Second Reading referred to Elections and Ethics |
2015-03-16 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2015-03-03 | Senate | coauthored by Grau (principal House author) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Emergency removed |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; CR filed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Griffin |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |