OK SB158 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-18 - coauthored by Moore, Reynolds, Ownbey
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-18 - coauthored by Moore, Reynolds, Ownbey
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Higher education; requiring legislative approval for master lease program bonds. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Higher education; requiring legislative approval for master lease program bonds. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick Anderson [R] | Rep. Jason Murphey [R] | Sen. Jim Reynolds [R] | Rep. Pat Ownbey [R] |
Rep. Lewis Moore [R] | Sen. Al McAffrey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-18 | Senate | coauthored by Moore, Reynolds, Ownbey |
2013-02-18 | Senate | coauthored by McAffrey |
2013-02-11 | Senate | coauthored by Murphey (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Anderson |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 3206 | 6 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3206 | 6a | New Code | See Bill Text |
Oklahoma State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb158&Session=1300 |
Text | http://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/2013-14bills/SB/sb158_int.rtf |