OK SB156 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Small claims procedure; expanding actions eligible for small claims docket. Effective date.
Title
Small claims procedure; expanding actions eligible for small claims docket. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2011-03-09 | First Reading | |
2011-03-09 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-08 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-08 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-02-28 | coauthored by McCullough (principal House author) | |
2011-02-28 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Ivester | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
12 | 1751 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
12 | 1757 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
12 | 1759 | New Code | See Bill Text |