OK SB1525 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Approved by Governor 04/17/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Approved by Governor 04/17/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Department of Human Services; removing certain membership requirement for specified advisory committee. Effective date.
Title
Department of Human Services; removing certain membership requirement for specified advisory committee. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Health & Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Health & Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/17/2024 |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2024-04-15 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2024-04-11 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2024-04-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 0 |
2024-04-11 | House | General Order |
2024-03-26 | House | CR; Do Pass General Government Committee |
2024-03-25 | House | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2024-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2024-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Lawson (principal House author) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Gollihare |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |