OK SB1435 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-16 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-16 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Student discipline; allowing a school district to adopt alternative disciplinary actions. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Student discipline; allowing a school district to adopt alternative disciplinary actions. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-12 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE AND ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2018-04-16 | House | Title stricken |
2018-04-16 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Common Education Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2018-03-19 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 0 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Ikley-Freeman |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Nollan (principal House author) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sharp |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 24 | 101 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 6 | 149 | New Code | See Bill Text |