OK SB1423 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Tax on freight cars; modifying apportionment. Effective date. Emergeny.
Title
Tax on freight cars; modifying apportionment. Effective date. Emergeny.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 34 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 34 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2018-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2018-03-08 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 8 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Title restored |
2018-03-07 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McCall (principal House author) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Schulz |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |